LA HB169 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes a data system for collection of information on health effects and outcomes associated with medical marijuana (EG INCREASE SG EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes a data system for collection of information on health effects and outcomes associated with medical marijuana (EG INCREASE SG EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - House - House Vote on HB 169 FINAL PASSAGE (#432) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-05-22SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-21HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-09HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/21/19.
2019-05-08HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-07HouseReported favorably (8-0).
2019-05-02HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2019-05-01HouseReported favorably (12-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-03-26HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-03-26HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB169&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1118640
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129736
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131926
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136273
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132126
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135660
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1118678
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129465
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129876
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131009
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136546
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136256

Bill Comments

feedback