LA HB169 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-18 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-18 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires state entities, officials, and employees to provide information to the legislature
Title
Requires state entities, officials, and employees to provide information to the legislature
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-13 - House - House Vote on HB 169 FINAL PASSAGE (#346) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-18 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2015-05-13 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2015-05-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/13/2015. |
2015-05-07 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-05-06 | House | Reported with amendments (9-0). |
2015-04-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2015-03-27 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/27/2015. |
2015-03-26 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2015-03-26 | House | Prefiled. |