LA HB169 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-14 - Effective date: August 15, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-14 - Effective date: August 15, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the use of sound suppressors when taking nongame nuisance quadrupeds
Title
Authorizes the use of sound suppressors when taking nongame nuisance quadrupeds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 169, FINAL PASSAGE (#411) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - House - House Vote on HB 169, FINAL PASSAGE (#24) (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - House - House Vote on HB 169, FINAL PASSAGE (#24) (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-14 | Effective date: August 15, 2011. | |
2011-06-14 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 29. | |
2011-06-13 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2011-06-13 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-06-09 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-08 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2011-06-08 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-05-25 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2011-05-24 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-05-23 | Reported favorably. | |
2011-05-03 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. | |
2011-05-03 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 4. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-04-28 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/3/2011. | |
2011-04-28 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-04-27 | Reported with amendments (16-0-1) (Regular). | |
2011-04-25 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. | |
2011-04-18 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011. | |
2011-04-12 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. | |
2011-04-12 | Prefiled. |