LA HB168 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Effective date: July 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Effective date: July 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for ancillary expenses of state government
Title
Provides for ancillary expenses of state government
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 168 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#919) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 168 FINAL PASSAGE (#927) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - House - House Vote on HB 168 FINAL PASSAGE (#329) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 168 FINAL PASSAGE (#927) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - House - House Vote on HB 168 FINAL PASSAGE (#329) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | House | Effective date: July 1, 2013. |
2013-06-20 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 44. |
2013-06-06 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-05 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2013-06-05 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2013-06-04 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/5/2013. |
2013-06-04 | House | Notice given. |
2013-06-04 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-06-03 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/4/2013. |
2013-06-03 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2013-06-01 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-06-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-05-09 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 102, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-07 | House | Made Special Order of the day No. 3 for 5/9/2013. |
2013-05-07 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-05-06 | House | Reported favorably (16-0) (Regular). |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2013-03-22 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/22/2013. |
2013-03-20 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2013-03-20 | House | Prefiled. |