LA HB167 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for unauthorized acts relative to motor vehicles

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for unauthorized acts relative to motor vehicles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-25 - House - House Vote on HB 167 FINAL PASSAGE (#39) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2017-05-15SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2017-05-11SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2017-05-10SenateReported with amendments.
2017-05-01SenateRules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
2017-04-27SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2017-04-26SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2017-04-25HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2017-04-20HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/25/17.
2017-04-19HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2017-04-18HouseReported with amendments (14-0).
2017-04-10HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
2017-03-28HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
2017-03-28HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=17rs&b=HB167&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1027647
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1033611
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1035730
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1033597
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1032933
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1033970
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1040272
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1027660
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1033897
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1035828
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1040611
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1035709

Bill Comments

feedback