LA HB167 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits the State Bd. of Elementary and Secondary Education (BESE) from authorizing certain types of charter schools under certain fiscal circumstances

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits the State Bd. of Elementary and Secondary Education (BESE) from authorizing certain types of charter schools under certain fiscal circumstances

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-13HouseInvoluntarily deferred in committee.
2016-03-14HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2016-02-26HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/26/2016.
2016-02-24HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
2016-02-24HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback