LA HB167 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Effective date: August 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the type of information provided to an institution of postsecondary education requesting criminal history information for an applicant or prospective employee

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the type of information provided to an institution of postsecondary education requesting criminal history information for an applicant or prospective employee

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 167 FINAL PASSAGE (#520) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - House - House Vote on HB 167 FINAL PASSAGE (#225) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-07HouseEffective date: August 1, 2013.
2013-06-07HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 133.
2013-05-30HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2013-05-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2013-05-28HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2013-05-22HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2013-05-22SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2013-05-16SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2013-05-15SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2013-05-14SenateReported favorably.
2013-05-07SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
2013-05-06SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2013-05-01HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2013-04-25HouseScheduled for floor debate on 5/1/2013.
2013-04-25HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
2013-04-24HouseReported with amendments (9-0) (Regular).
2013-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2013-03-22HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/22/2013.
2013-03-20HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2013-03-20HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=13rs&b=HB167&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=830507
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=841327
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=843877
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=850595
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=856970
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=841068
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=841306
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=843144
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=830522
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=841502
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=844119
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=859230
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=843834
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=850520

Bill Comments

feedback