LA HB165 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-03 - Effective date: 01/01/18.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for identification of dental benefit plan coverage

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for identification of dental benefit plan coverage

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 165 FINAL PASSAGE (#467) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Vote on HB 165 FINAL PASSAGE (#140) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-03HouseEffective date: 01/01/18.
2017-06-03HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 34.
2017-05-25HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2017-05-25SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2017-05-24HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2017-05-23HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2017-05-23SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2017-05-23SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2017-05-23SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2017-05-23SenateRules suspended.
2017-05-22SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2017-05-18SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2017-05-17SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably.
2017-05-08SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2017-05-03SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2017-05-02HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2017-04-27HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/02/17.
2017-04-27HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2017-04-26HouseReported with amendments (14-0).
2017-04-10HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2017-03-28HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2017-03-28HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=17rs&b=HB165&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1027641
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1035968
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1044527
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1048801
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1035571
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1035935
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1027665
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1036116
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1055774
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1038095
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1044444

Bill Comments

feedback