LA HB160 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-12 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-12 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits local governments from using mounted traffic cameras to issue traffic violations
Title
Prohibits local governments from using mounted traffic cameras to issue traffic violations
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffery Arnold [D] | Rep. Henry Burns [R] | Rep. Billy Chandler [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] |
Rep. Jerry Gisclair [D] | Rep. Jerome Richard [I] | Rep. Cedric Richmond [D] | Rep. M.J. Smiley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | Involuntarily deferred in committee. | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |
2010-03-12 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/12/2010. | |
2010-03-08 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |
2010-03-08 | Prefiled. |
Subjects
Louisiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/byinst.asp?sessionid=10RS&billid=HB160 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=680097 |