LA HB159 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the definition of domestic abuse

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the definition of domestic abuse

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 159 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1149) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 159 FINAL PASSAGE (#867) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Vote on HB 159 FINAL PASSAGE (#11) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-10HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-06-09HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/10/2021.
2021-06-09HouseConference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
2021-06-09HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2021-06-09SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Jackson, Cortez, and Ward.
2021-06-09SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2021-06-09SenateNotice House rejected the Senate amendments.
2021-06-08HouseHouse conferees appointed: White, Gregory Miller, and Schexnayder.
2021-06-08HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 101, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
2021-06-08HouseCalled from the calendar.
2021-06-08HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-06-07HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/08/2021.
2021-06-07HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2021-06-07SenateRules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-05-27SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-05-26SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-25SenateReported with amendments.
2021-04-20SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
2021-04-19SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-04-15HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-04-14HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/15/2021.
2021-04-14HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-04-13HouseReported with amendments (12-0-1).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2021-03-19HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2021.
2021-03-19HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2021-03-19HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB159&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1205187
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1213596
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1214440
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1213366
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1213577
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1214082
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1214397
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225258
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225238
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225210
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1227784
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1227996
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230280
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1205190
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1213696
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1214486
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228204
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228867
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232913
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234162
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1214422
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232439
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233564

Bill Comments 750

feedback