LA HB159 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Passed on June 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-29 - Effective date: August 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Adds a fee at license renewal for pharmacists and pharmacies and dedicates proceeds to certain pharmacy education programs (EN INCREASE SG RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds a fee at license renewal for pharmacists and pharmacies and dedicates proceeds to certain pharmacy education programs (EN INCREASE SG RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 159 FINAL PASSAGE (#758) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - House Vote on HB 159 FINAL PASSAGE (#119) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-29HouseEffective date: August 1, 2015.
2015-06-29HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 298.
2015-06-09HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2015-06-08SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2015-06-07HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2015-06-07HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2015-06-04SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2015-06-03SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2015-06-02SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2015-06-01SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably.
2015-05-21SenateRead by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2015-05-20SenateReported favorably.
2015-05-04SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2015-04-30SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2015-04-29HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2015-04-29HouseCalled from the calendar.
2015-04-27HouseScheduled for floor debate on 4/29/2015.
2015-04-27HouseNotice given.
2015-04-27HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2015-04-22HouseScheduled for floor debate on 4/27/2015.
2015-04-22HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2015-04-21HouseReported with amendments (16-0).
2015-04-13HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2015-03-27HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/27/2015.
2015-03-25HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2015-03-25HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=15rs&b=HB159&sbi=y
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=930938
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=940451
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=943333
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=956034
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=960209
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=939000
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=940258
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=941091
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=943048
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=930965
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=939579
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=940468
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=941602
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=943406
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=944140
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=956812
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=962579
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=943171
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=955814

Bill Comments

feedback