LA HB159 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - Effective date: July 1, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Creates the Ouachita Riverfront Development Commission (EN INCREASE LF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the Ouachita Riverfront Development Commission (EN INCREASE LF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 159, ADOPT (#1022) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - House - House Vote on HB 159, MOTION TO ADOPT (#920) (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - House - House Vote on HB 159, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#791) (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 159, FINAL PASSAGE (#685) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - House - House Vote on HB 159, FINAL PASSAGE (#123) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-28 Effective date: July 1, 2011.
2011-06-28 Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 254.
2011-06-24 Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
2011-06-23 Signed by the President of the Senate on June 24.
2011-06-23 Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2011-06-23 Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2011-06-23 Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
2011-06-23 Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2011-06-23 Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 81, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2011-06-22 Scheduled for floor debate on 6/23/2011.
2011-06-22 Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
2011-06-22 Conference committee report received.
2011-06-21 Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
2011-06-21 Senate conference committee members appointed: Crowe, Thompson, and Jackson, L..
2011-06-21 Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2011-06-21 Notice House rejected Senate amendments.
2011-06-21 House conferees appointed: Rosalind Jones, Barrow, and Katz.
2011-06-21 Read by title, roll called, yeas 83, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
2011-06-20 Scheduled for concurrence on 6/21/2011.
2011-06-19 Scheduled for concurrence on 6/20/2011.
2011-06-16 Scheduled for concurrence on 6/19/2011.
2011-06-16 Received from the Senate with amendments.
2011-06-16 Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2011-06-16 Rules suspended. Called from the calendar.
2011-06-14 Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2011-06-14 Rules suspended
2011-06-08 Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2011-06-07 Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2011-06-06 Reported favorably.
2011-05-17 Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
2011-05-16 Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2011-05-12 Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2011-05-10 Scheduled for floor debate on 5/12/2011.
2011-05-10 Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar.
2011-05-09 Reported favorably (14-0) (Local and Consent).
2011-04-25 Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2011-04-18 First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011.
2011-04-12 Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2011-04-12 Prefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/byinst.asp?sessionid=11RS&billid=HB159
Texthttps://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=738838
Texthttps://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=745335
Texthttps://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=747004
Texthttps://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=759625
Texthttps://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=760443
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=746974
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=756398
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=758152
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=759340
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=759504

Bill Comments

feedback