LA HB155 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Effective date: 07/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Effective date: 07/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the fees levied by the La. Tax Commission for assessment of certain properties (EN +$120,000 SD RV See Note)
Title
Increases the fees levied by the La. Tax Commission for assessment of certain properties (EN +$120,000 SD RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 155 FINAL PASSAGE (#661) (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Vote on HB 155 FINAL PASSAGE (#132) (Y: 70 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Vote on HB 155 FINAL PASSAGE (#132) (Y: 69 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Vote on HB 155 FINAL PASSAGE (#132) (Y: 70 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Vote on HB 155 FINAL PASSAGE (#132) (Y: 69 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-11 | House | Effective date: 07/01/2018. |
2018-05-11 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 120. |
2018-05-03 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-02 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-01 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 2 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-03-27 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 70, nays 18. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-03-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/27/18. |
2018-03-21 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-03-20 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2018-02-26 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2018-02-26 | House | Prefiled. |