LA HB150 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana, provides for the payment of benefits for retired adjunct professors during reemployment (EN INCREASE APV)
Title
Relative to the Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana, provides for the payment of benefits for retired adjunct professors during reemployment (EN INCREASE APV)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 150, ADOPT (#1030) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - House - House Vote on HB 150, MOTION TO ADOPT (#942) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - House - House Vote on HB 150, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#823) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 150, FINAL PASSAGE (#800) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 150, AMENDMENT # 3028 BY MARTINY, HB 150 BY DOWNS (#799) (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - House - House Vote on HB 150, FINAL PASSAGE (#137) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - House - House Vote on HB 150, MOTION TO ADOPT (#942) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - House - House Vote on HB 150, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#823) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 150, FINAL PASSAGE (#800) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 150, AMENDMENT # 3028 BY MARTINY, HB 150 BY DOWNS (#799) (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - House - House Vote on HB 150, FINAL PASSAGE (#137) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-01 | Effective date: See Act. | |
2011-07-01 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 388. | |
2011-06-24 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2011-06-23 | Signed by the President of the Senate on June 24. | |
2011-06-23 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-23 | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. | |
2011-06-23 | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2011-06-23 | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. | |
2011-06-23 | Rules suspended. Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0. Having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the Conference Committee Report was adopted. | |
2011-06-22 | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. | |
2011-06-22 | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. | |
2011-06-22 | Senate conference committee members appointed: Gautreaux, Nevers, and Martiny. | |
2011-06-21 | House conferees appointed: Downs, Pearson, and Cortez. | |
2011-06-21 | Notice House rejected Senate amendments. | |
2011-06-21 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. | |
2011-06-20 | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/21/2011. | |
2011-06-20 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2011-06-20 | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. The amended bill was read by title, finally passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-06-19 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2011-06-16 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-06-15 | Reported favorably. | |
2011-06-07 | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. | |
2011-06-06 | Reported favorably. | |
2011-05-17 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement. | |
2011-05-16 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2011-05-12 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-05-10 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/12/2011. | |
2011-05-10 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-05-09 | Reported with amendments (7-3) (Regular). | |
2011-04-25 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. | |
2011-04-18 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011. | |
2011-04-12 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. | |
2011-04-12 | Prefiled. |