LA HB15 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-13 - Effective date: 08/01/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for membership of certain new hires of the Lafayette City-Parish Consolidated Government in the Parochial Employees' Retirement System of Louisiana (EN NO IMPACT APV)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for membership of certain new hires of the Lafayette City-Parish Consolidated Government in the Parochial Employees' Retirement System of Louisiana (EN NO IMPACT APV)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 15 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#667) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 15 FINAL PASSAGE (#400) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 15 HB 15 BY COUSSAN (#101) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-13HouseEffective date: 08/01/2020.
2020-06-13HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 298.
2020-06-03HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-06-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-06-01HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-05-31HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2020-05-28HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/31/20.
2020-05-28HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2020-05-27SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-26SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-26SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-25SenateReported with amendments.
2020-05-18SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2020-05-15HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-13HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/15/20.
2020-05-13HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-07HouseReported favorably (9-0).
2020-05-04HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2020-03-31HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.
2020-01-24HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/24/2020.
2020-01-23HousePrefiled. To be introduced at a later date.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=HB15&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1151861
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1164617
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170353
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170838
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173268
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174991
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175806
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177231
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178553
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178946
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182375
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170150
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171749
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175562
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176495
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177447
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178283
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1151863
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170509
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173311
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175587
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172968
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176591

Bill Comments

feedback