LA HB149 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Effective date: 08/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to various provisions affecting parole (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to various provisions affecting parole (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 149 FINAL PASSAGE (#732) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Vote on HB 149 FINAL PASSAGE (#270) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20HouseEffective date: 08/01/2019.
2019-06-20HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 369.
2019-06-05HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-06-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-03HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-02HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2019-06-01SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-23SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-22SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-21SenateReported favorably.
2019-05-16SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2019-05-15SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-14HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 87, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/14/19.
2019-05-02HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-01HouseReported with amendments (12-0-1).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2019-03-25HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2019-03-25HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB149&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1118032
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130226
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133969
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141252
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1144520
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125214
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130035
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128732
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130290
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1118057
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129454
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130378
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130901
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134087
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135201
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142590
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1145429
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133965
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140782

Bill Comments

feedback