LA HB149 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Effective date: May 31, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Effective date: May 31, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Defines the terms "elementary school", "middle school", "junior high school", and "high school" for purposes of general school law
Title
Defines the terms "elementary school", "middle school", "junior high school", and "high school" for purposes of general school law
Sponsors
Rep. Henry Burns [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-21 - House - House Vote on HB 149, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1004) (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 149, ADOPT (#926) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - House Vote on HB 149, FINAL PASSAGE (#310) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House Vote on HB 149, CALL FROM THE CALENDAR (#187) (Y: 65 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - House Vote on HB 149, FINAL PASSAGE (#135) (Y: 52 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 149, ADOPT (#926) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - House Vote on HB 149, FINAL PASSAGE (#310) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House Vote on HB 149, CALL FROM THE CALENDAR (#187) (Y: 65 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - House Vote on HB 149, FINAL PASSAGE (#135) (Y: 52 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-31 | Effective date: May 31, 2012. | |
2012-05-31 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 378. | |
2012-05-23 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2012-05-22 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-05-22 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-05-21 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 1, Senate amendments concurred in. | |
2012-05-16 | Scheduled for concurrence on 5/21/2012. | |
2012-05-14 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2012-05-14 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-05-09 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-05-08 | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-05-07 | Reported with amendments. | |
2012-04-12 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2012-04-11 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2012-04-10 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-04-10 | Called from the calendar. | |
2012-04-05 | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/10/2012. | |
2012-04-05 | Notice given. | |
2012-04-04 | Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules. | |
2012-04-04 | Called from the calendar. | |
2012-04-03 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2012-04-02 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 52, nays 44. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending. | |
2012-03-27 | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/2/2012. | |
2012-03-22 | Scheduled for floor debate on 3/29/2012. | |
2012-03-22 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-03-21 | Reported with amendments (14-3) (Regular). | |
2012-03-12 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2012-02-24 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/24/2012. | |
2012-02-20 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2012-02-20 | Prefiled. |