LA HB148 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-14 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
Pending: House Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture and Rural Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-14 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
Pending: House Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture and Rural Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires biannual rabies vaccinations in animals
Title
Requires biannual rabies vaccinations in animals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2016-02-26 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/26/2016. |
2016-02-23 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2016-02-23 | House | Prefiled. |