LA HB148 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-7)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-01 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

(Constitutional Amendment) Requires that monies received by the state from violations of certain federal and state laws associated with the Deepwater Horizon oil spill be deposited into the Coastal Protection and Restoration Fund (RE1 SEE FISC NOTE SD RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

(Constitutional Amendment) Requires that monies received by the state from violations of certain federal and state laws associated with the Deepwater Horizon oil spill be deposited into the Coastal Protection and Restoration Fund (RE1 SEE FISC NOTE SD RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 148 FINAL PASSAGE (#1603) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-20 - House - House Vote on HB 148 FINAL PASSAGE (#1066) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-01HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2014-05-30HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2014.
2014-05-30HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2014-05-30SenateRules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2014-05-29SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2014-05-28SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2014-05-21SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
2014-05-20HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2014-05-15HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/20/2014.
2014-05-13HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2014-05-12HouseReported without amendments (12-0).
2014-05-06HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2014-05-05HouseReported favorably (17-0. To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2014-03-10HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2014-02-14HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/14/2014.
2014-02-13HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2014-02-13HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=14rs&b=HB148&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=870286
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=900015
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=906294
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=900301
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=908970
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=909899
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=910802
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=911483
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=870304
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=885065
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=900249
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=905712
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=906412
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=908321
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=909098
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=906225
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=911005

Bill Comments

feedback