LA HB148 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-07 - Effective date: August 15, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Expands the type of risk-based capital reports that shall be included within the definition of company-action level events

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expands the type of risk-based capital reports that shall be included within the definition of company-action level events

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 148, FINAL PASSAGE (#263) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - House - House Vote on HB 148, FINAL PASSAGE (#23) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-07 Effective date: August 15, 2011.
2011-06-07 Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 11.
2011-05-31 Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
2011-05-31 Signed by the President of the Senate.
2011-05-25 Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2011-05-24 Received from the Senate without amendments.
2011-05-24 Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2011-05-23 Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2011-05-19 Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2011-05-18 Reported favorably.
2011-05-03 Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2011-05-03 Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2011-04-28 Scheduled for floor debate on 5/3/2011.
2011-04-28 Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
2011-04-27 Reported favorably (10-0) (Regular).
2011-04-25 Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2011-04-18 First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011.
2011-04-11 Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2011-04-11 Prefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback