LA HB147 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Effective date: August 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the town of Duson to levy a hotel occupancy tax (EN +$56,092 LF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the town of Duson to levy a hotel occupancy tax (EN +$56,092 LF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 147 FINAL PASSAGE (#439) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - House Vote on HB 147 FINAL PASSAGE (#127) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-05HouseEffective date: August 1, 2015.
2015-06-05HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 53.
2015-05-27HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2015-05-27SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2015-05-26HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2015-05-21HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2015-05-21SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2015-05-20SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2015-05-19SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2015-05-18SenateReported favorably.
2015-05-04SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
2015-04-30SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2015-04-30HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2015-04-27HouseScheduled for floor debate on 4/30/2015.
2015-04-27HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2015-04-22HouseReported favorably (12-0).
2015-04-13HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2015-03-27HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/27/2015.
2015-03-25HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2015-03-25HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=15rs&b=HB147&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=930922
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=941053
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=950734
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=957453
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=930951
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=937759
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=941279
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=942188
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=953448
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=963578
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=943508
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=950656

Bill Comments

feedback