LA HB147 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-17 - Effective date: June 17, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-17 - Effective date: June 17, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Milneburg Neighborhood Improvement District in Orleans Parish
Title
Creates the Milneburg Neighborhood Improvement District in Orleans Parish
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 147, FINAL PASSAGE (#1240) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 147, FINAL PASSAGE (#707) (Y: 85 N: 1 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 147, FINAL PASSAGE (#707) (Y: 85 N: 1 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-17 | Effective date: June 17, 2010. | |
2010-06-17 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 231. | |
2010-06-11 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-06-10 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-10 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-09 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2010-06-09 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-06-03 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-06-02 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-06-01 | Reported favorably. | |
2010-05-12 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. | |
2010-05-11 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2010-05-10 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-05-04 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 10, 2010. | |
2010-05-04 | Notice given. | |
2010-05-03 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2010-04-29 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 3, 2010. | |
2010-04-26 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-04-22 | Reported with amendments (13-0) (Regular). | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. | |
2010-03-05 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/5/2010. | |
2010-03-04 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. | |
2010-03-04 | Prefiled. |