LA HB1423 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-29 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-29 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the collection of court costs and attorney fees relative to a suit regarding damage to a condominium
Title
Provides for the collection of court costs and attorney fees relative to a suit regarding damage to a condominium
Sponsors
Rep. Nita Hutter [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on HB 1423, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1764) (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1423, FINAL PASSAGE (#1676) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 1423, FINAL PASSAGE (#1148) (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1423, FINAL PASSAGE (#1676) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 1423, FINAL PASSAGE (#1148) (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-29 | Effective date: August 15, 2010. | |
2010-06-29 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 753. | |
2010-06-20 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-06-18 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-18 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-18 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 87, nays 2, Senate amendments concurred in. | |
2010-06-17 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/18/2010. | |
2010-06-16 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2010-06-16 | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-06-10 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-06-09 | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-06-08 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. | |
2010-06-07 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. | |
2010-06-04 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2010-06-03 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-06-03 | Called from the calendar. | |
2010-06-03 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2010-05-27 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/3/2010. | |
2010-05-24 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-05-20 | Reported with amendments (12-0) (Regular). | |
2010-04-21 | Read by title, referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |
2010-04-20 | Read by title. |