LA HB142 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to investment authority of the treasurer (EN SEE FISC NOTE SD RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to investment authority of the treasurer (EN SEE FISC NOTE SD RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 142 FINAL PASSAGE (#716) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Vote on HB 142 FINAL PASSAGE (#135) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-11HouseEffective date: See Act.
2021-06-11HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 170.
2021-06-08HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2021-06-08SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2021-06-07HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-03HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2021-06-02SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-06-01SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-06-01SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-04SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
2021-05-03SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-04-29HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-04-27HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/29/2021.
2021-04-27HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-04-26HouseReported with amendments (18-0).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2021-03-19HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2021.
2021-03-17HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2021-03-17HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB142&sbi=y
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1204596
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217331
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219284
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231502
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235098
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1206196
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217301
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217617
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217753
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1204601
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1213918
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217496
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217867
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219351
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222921
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233022
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1238641
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219169
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231066

Bill Comments

feedback