LA HB142 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Effective date: 08/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes additional means of harvesting oysters on the oyster seed grounds under the oyster seed ground vessel permit

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes additional means of harvesting oysters on the oyster seed grounds under the oyster seed ground vessel permit

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 142 FINAL PASSAGE (#824) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Vote on HB 142 FINAL PASSAGE (#268) (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-06HouseEffective date: 08/01/2019.
2019-06-06HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 144.
2019-06-05HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-06-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-03HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-02HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2019-06-02SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-06-02SenateRules suspended.
2019-05-31SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-30SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-16SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
2019-05-15SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-14HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 80, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/14/19.
2019-05-02HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-01HouseReported favorably (12-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
2019-03-25HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
2019-03-25HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback