LA HB141 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-8-3)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date: 08/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to motorcyclist profiling training for peace officers (EN +$31,000 GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to motorcyclist profiling training for peace officers (EN +$31,000 GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-03 - House - House Vote on HB 141 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#875) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 141 FINAL PASSAGE (#787) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 141 FINAL PASSAGE (#341) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11HouseEffective date: 08/01/2019.
2019-06-11HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 294.
2019-06-05HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-06-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-04HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-03HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 103, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2019-06-02HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/03/19.
2019-06-02HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2019-06-02SenateRules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-30SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-29SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-28SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments.
2019-05-20SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2019-05-16SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-15HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-07HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/15/19.
2019-05-06HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-02HouseReported with amendments (13-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2019-03-25HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2019-03-25HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB141&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1117935
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130536
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142083
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1144224
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128328
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130509
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138264
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141459
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141908
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1117945
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124083
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130741
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130900
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138392
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140597
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143104
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1145649
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134730
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141033

Bill Comments

feedback