LA HB141 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-05 - Effective date: 08/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-05 - Effective date: 08/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the content of actuarial notes
Title
Provides for the content of actuarial notes
Sponsors
Rep. Walt Leger [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 141 FINAL PASSAGE (#927) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - House - House Vote on HB 141 FINAL PASSAGE (#331) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - House - House Vote on HB 141 FINAL PASSAGE (#331) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-05 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2016. |
2016-06-05 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 353. |
2016-05-26 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-05-25 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-05-24 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-04-18 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-04-14 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/18/2016. |
2016-04-11 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-04-07 | House | Reported favorably (7-0). |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2016-02-26 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/26/2016. |
2016-02-23 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2016-02-23 | House | Prefiled. |