LA HB140 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 42-2)
Status: Passed on June 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-13 - Effective date: 08/01/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the preemption of state law for firearms

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the preemption of state law for firearms

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 140 ADOPT (#732) (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - House - House Vote on HB 140 MOTION TO ADOPT (#764) (Y: 71 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 140 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#670) (Y: 71 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 140 FINAL PASSAGE (#580) (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 140 FINAL PASSAGE (#375) (Y: 70 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-13HouseEffective date: 08/01/2020.
2020-06-13HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 299.
2020-06-03HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-06-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-06-01HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-06-01HouseNotice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2020-06-01SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 28 yeas and 8 nays.
2020-06-01SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2020-06-01HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 71, nays 23. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2020-06-01HouseConference Committee report received.
2020-05-31HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2020-05-31SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Foil, Mizell, and Smith.
2020-05-31SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2020-05-31SenateNotice House rejected the Senate amendments.
2020-05-31HouseHouse conferees appointed: Miguez, James, and Riser.
2020-05-31HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 71, nays 24, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
2020-05-29HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/31/20.
2020-05-29HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2020-05-29SenateRules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 3 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-28SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-28SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-25SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
2020-05-22HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 70, nays 28. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-20HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20.
2020-05-18HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-15HouseReported favorably (7-3).
2020-03-09HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2020-02-24HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/24/2020.
2020-02-24HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2020-02-24HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=HB140&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1158010
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172297
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175591
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179237
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182376
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174473
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177255
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177854
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178289
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1158024
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172533
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175661
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178724
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185717
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175534
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177712
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178768
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179012

Bill Comments

feedback