LA HB14 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-04 - Effective date: 08/01/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the refund of employee contributions to the Firefighters' Retirement System (EN NO IMPACT APV)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the refund of employee contributions to the Firefighters' Retirement System (EN NO IMPACT APV)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 14 FINAL PASSAGE (#399) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 14 FINAL PASSAGE (#100) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-04HouseEffective date: 08/01/2020.
2020-06-04HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 4.
2020-06-01HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-05-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-05-28HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-05-28HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2020-05-27SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-26SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-26SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-18SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2020-05-15HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-13HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/15/20.
2020-05-13HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-07HouseReported favorably (8-0).
2020-03-09HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2020-01-24HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/24/2020.
2020-01-22HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2020-01-22HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback