LA HB14 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Effective date: 07/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the reemployment of retired interpreters, educational transliterators, and certified educators of the hearing impaired in positions covered by the Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana (EN INCREASE APV)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the reemployment of retired interpreters, educational transliterators, and certified educators of the hearing impaired in positions covered by the Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana (EN INCREASE APV)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 14 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1196) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 14 CO-AUTHORS (#1095) (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 14 FINAL PASSAGE (#1094) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House Vote on HB 14 FINAL PASSAGE (#539) (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23HouseEffective date: 07/01/2018.
2018-05-23HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 492.
2018-05-18HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2018-05-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-17HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-16HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 88, nays 0. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in.
2018-05-16HouseRules suspended, called out of its regular order.
2018-05-15HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/16/18.
2018-05-14HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2018-05-14SenateRules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-05-11SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-05-11SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-05-10SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably.
2018-05-08SenateRead by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2018-05-08SenateSenate Committee amendments read and adopted.
2018-05-08SenateRules suspended.
2018-05-07SenateReported with amendments.
2018-04-25SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2018-04-24SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-04-23HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 84, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-04-19HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/23/18.
2018-04-16HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-13HouseReported with amendments (5-0).
2018-03-12HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2018-01-26HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/26/2018.
2018-01-24HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2018-01-24HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=HB14&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1061298
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1073797
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1086422
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1088974
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1089256
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090737
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1094970
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098216
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1099085
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1102011
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1086379
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1086306
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1073717
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1087349
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1093245
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097583
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098199
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1061310
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1086470
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1089285
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1093578
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1107247
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1089158
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096602
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096603

Bill Comments

feedback