LA HB14 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date: 06/17/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date: 06/17/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Replaces the chairman of the House Committee on Retirement with a member of the House Committee on Retirement appointed by the speaker of the House of Representatives as trustee on each state and statewide retirement system board (EN NO IMPACT APV)
Title
Replaces the chairman of the House Committee on Retirement with a member of the House Committee on Retirement appointed by the speaker of the House of Representatives as trustee on each state and statewide retirement system board (EN NO IMPACT APV)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 14 FINAL PASSAGE (#1079) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - House - House Vote on HB 14 FINAL PASSAGE (#455) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - House - House Vote on HB 14 FINAL PASSAGE (#455) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | House | Effective date: 06/17/2016. |
2016-06-17 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 621. |
2016-06-06 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-05-31 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-05-26 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-04-25 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-04-25 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2016-04-25 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2016-04-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/25/2016. |
2016-04-18 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-04-14 | House | Reported with amendments (5-0). |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2016-01-29 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/15/2016. |
2016-01-14 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2016-01-14 | House | Prefiled. |