LA HB139 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-02 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-02 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires prior approval of the Joint Legislative Committee on the Budget of requests for proposals, contracts, and cooperative endeavor agreements over a specified dollar amount (EG1 SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Requires prior approval of the Joint Legislative Committee on the Budget of requests for proposals, contracts, and cooperative endeavor agreements over a specified dollar amount (EG1 SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 139 FINAL PASSAGE (#299) (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 36) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-02 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2017-05-15 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 69, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-05-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/17. |
2017-05-09 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-08 | House | Reported with amendments (19-0). |
2017-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2017-03-27 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2017-03-27 | House | Prefiled. |