LA HB137 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Privatization Review Act (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Creates the Privatization Review Act (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-09 - House - House Vote on HB 137 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#927) (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2015-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 137 FINAL PASSAGE (#898) (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - House - House Vote on HB 137 FINAL PASSAGE (#427) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 137 FINAL PASSAGE (#898) (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - House - House Vote on HB 137 FINAL PASSAGE (#427) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | House | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2015-06-11 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2015-06-09 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-06-09 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 86, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2015-06-07 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/09/2015. |
2015-06-07 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2015-06-06 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 3 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2015-05-20 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2015-05-14 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/20/2015. |
2015-05-13 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-05-12 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2015-05-05 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2015-05-04 | House | Reported favorably (17-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2015-04-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2015-03-27 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/27/2015. |
2015-03-24 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2015-03-24 | House | Prefiled. |