LA HB135 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-10 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-10 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases state supplemental pay for firefighters and certain law enforcement officers (OR +$25,228,800 GF EX See Note)
Title
Increases state supplemental pay for firefighters and certain law enforcement officers (OR +$25,228,800 GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2014-02-14 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/14/2014. |
2014-02-11 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2014-02-11 | House | Prefiled. |