LA HB134 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Effective date: 01/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Effective date: 01/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for identification of health plan coverage type
Title
Provides for identification of health plan coverage type
Sponsors
Rep. John Anders [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 134 FINAL PASSAGE (#711) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House Vote on HB 134 FINAL PASSAGE (#52) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House Vote on HB 134 FINAL PASSAGE (#52) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | House | Effective date: 01/01/2019. |
2018-05-10 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 62. |
2018-05-08 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-07 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-03 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-03-20 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-03-15 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/20/18. |
2018-03-15 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-03-14 | House | Reported favorably (8-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2018-02-25 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2018-02-25 | House | Prefiled. |