LA HB1325 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides a limitation of liability for any entity contracted to manage or operate the Regional Transit Authority
Title
Provides a limitation of liability for any entity contracted to manage or operate the Regional Transit Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1325, FINAL PASSAGE (#1775) (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 1325, FINAL PASSAGE (#613) (Y: 54 N: 37 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 1325, FINAL PASSAGE (#613) (Y: 54 N: 37 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-30 | Effective date: August 15, 2010. | |
2010-06-30 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 854. | |
2010-06-20 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-06-18 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-18 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-17 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2010-06-17 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-06-14 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-06-11 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-06-10 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. | |
2010-05-11 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | |
2010-05-10 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2010-05-05 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 54, nays 37. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-05-05 | Called from the calendar. | |
2010-05-05 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2010-04-29 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 5, 2010. | |
2010-04-28 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar. | |
2010-04-27 | Reported favorably (12-0-1) (Local and Consent). | |
2010-04-20 | Read by title, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |
2010-04-19 | Read by title. |