LA HB132 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-18 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 31, nays 63. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-18 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 31, nays 63. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the authority of the state fire marshal
Title
Provides relative to the authority of the state fire marshal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 132, FINAL PASSAGE (#227) (Y: 31 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2011-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 132, AMENDMENT # 79 BY JOHNSON, MOTION TO ADOPT (#226) (Y: 30 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2011-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 132, AMENDMENT # 78A BY DIXON, MOTION TO ADOPT (#225) (Y: 33 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2011-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 132, AMENDMENT # 76 BY FANNIN, MOTION TO ADOPT (#224) (Y: 34 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2011-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 132, AMENDMENT # 75 BY MORENO, MOTION TO ADOPT (#223) (Y: 44 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 132, AMENDMENT # 71A BY TALBOT, MOTION TO ADOPT (#222) (Y: 39 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [FAIL]
2011-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 132, AMENDMENT # 65 BY CARMODY, MOTION TO ADOPT (#221) (Y: 43 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2011-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 132, AMENDMENT # 64 BY CORTEZ, MOTION TO ADOPT (#220) (Y: 39 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2011-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 132, AMENDMENT # 64 BY CORTEZ, END CONSIDERATION OF AMENDMENTS (#219) (Y: 37 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2011-05-09 - House - House Vote on HB 132, AMENDMENT # 15 BY CHANDLER, MOTION TO ADOPT (#66) (Y: 43 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2011-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 132, AMENDMENT # 79 BY JOHNSON, MOTION TO ADOPT (#226) (Y: 30 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2011-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 132, AMENDMENT # 78A BY DIXON, MOTION TO ADOPT (#225) (Y: 33 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2011-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 132, AMENDMENT # 76 BY FANNIN, MOTION TO ADOPT (#224) (Y: 34 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2011-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 132, AMENDMENT # 75 BY MORENO, MOTION TO ADOPT (#223) (Y: 44 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 132, AMENDMENT # 71A BY TALBOT, MOTION TO ADOPT (#222) (Y: 39 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [FAIL]
2011-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 132, AMENDMENT # 65 BY CARMODY, MOTION TO ADOPT (#221) (Y: 43 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2011-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 132, AMENDMENT # 64 BY CORTEZ, MOTION TO ADOPT (#220) (Y: 39 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2011-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 132, AMENDMENT # 64 BY CORTEZ, END CONSIDERATION OF AMENDMENTS (#219) (Y: 37 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2011-05-09 - House - House Vote on HB 132, AMENDMENT # 15 BY CHANDLER, MOTION TO ADOPT (#66) (Y: 43 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-18 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 31, nays 63. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-05-18 | Called from the calendar. | |
2011-05-12 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/18/2011. | |
2011-05-12 | Notice given. | |
2011-05-09 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2011-05-04 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/9/2011. | |
2011-05-04 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-05-03 | Reported with amendments (8-6) (Regular). | |
2011-04-25 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |
2011-04-18 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011. | |
2011-04-11 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |
2011-04-11 | Prefiled. |