LA HB131 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
(Constitutional Amendment) Requires legislation relative to tax rebates, tax incentives, and tax abatements to be introduced or considered during regular sessions convening in odd-numbered years
Title
(Constitutional Amendment) Requires legislation relative to tax rebates, tax incentives, and tax abatements to be introduced or considered during regular sessions convening in odd-numbered years
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 131 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#923) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2013-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 131 FINAL PASSAGE (#851) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 131 AMENDMENT # 3276 BY ADLEY HB 131 BY JAMES (#850) (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - House - House Vote on HB 131 FINAL PASSAGE (#230) (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 131 FINAL PASSAGE (#851) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 131 AMENDMENT # 3276 BY ADLEY HB 131 BY JAMES (#850) (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - House - House Vote on HB 131 FINAL PASSAGE (#230) (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-26 | House | Effective date: See Act. |
2013-06-26 | House | Becomes Act No. 435. |
2013-06-06 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-06 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 88, nays 0. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in. |
2013-06-06 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2013-06-05 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/6/2013. |
2013-06-05 | House | Notice given. |
2013-06-04 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/5/2013. |
2013-06-04 | House | Notice given. |
2013-06-04 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2013-06-03 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/04/2013. |
2013-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-05-01 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 6. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-01 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2013-05-01 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2013-04-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/1/2013. |
2013-04-24 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-04-23 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0) (Regular). |
2013-04-18 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2013-04-17 | House | Reported favorably (10-0) (Regular) To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2013-03-22 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/22/2013. |
2013-03-18 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2013-03-18 | House | Prefiled. |