LA HB131 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-07 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 30, nays 61. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-07 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 30, nays 61. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that the grand and petit jury venire lists be made available to the public without having to be published (EG DECREASE LF EX See Note)
Title
Provides that the grand and petit jury venire lists be made available to the public without having to be published (EG DECREASE LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Mack White [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on HB 131, FINAL PASSAGE (#58) (Y: 30 N: 61 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
House - House Vote on HB 131, AMENDMENT B-13A, MOTION TO ADOPT (#57) (Y: 52 N: 34 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 131, AMENDMENT B-13A, MOTION TO ADOPT (#57) (Y: 52 N: 34 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 30, nays 61. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-04-05 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 7, 2010. | |
2010-04-05 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-03-31 | Reported favorably (10-5) (Regular). | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2010-03-05 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/5/2010. | |
2010-03-04 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2010-03-04 | Prefiled. |