LA HB130 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - The amended bill was read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 7 yeas and 30 nays. Motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to occupant restraint systems on school buses (RE1 INCREASE LF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to occupant restraint systems on school buses (RE1 INCREASE LF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 130 FINAL PASSAGE (#918) (Y: 7 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 130 FINAL PASSAGE (#365) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-07SenateThe amended bill was read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 7 yeas and 30 nays. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-06-07SenateRules suspended.
2021-06-06SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-06-06SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-06-02SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title; recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2021-05-13SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
2021-05-12SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-05-11HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 55, nays 44. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-06HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2021.
2021-05-05HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-04HouseReported with amendments (8-0).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2021-03-19HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2021.
2021-03-17HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
2021-03-16HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB130&sbi=y
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1204261
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220587
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223593
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218554
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220535
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220862
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1227420
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1227416
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230655
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1204267
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219457
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220640
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222267
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223717
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224309
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231117
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230651
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223511
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232722

Bill Comments

feedback