LA HB13 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the board of trustees of the Firefighters' Retirement System (EG +$33,200 FC SG EX)
Title
Provides relative to the board of trustees of the Firefighters' Retirement System (EG +$33,200 FC SG EX)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - House - House Vote on HB 13 FINAL PASSAGE (#276) (Y: 86 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-04 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 15. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/04/2024. |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-02 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2024-01-19 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/19/2024. |
2024-01-18 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2024-01-18 | House | Prefiled. |