LA HB13 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes certain retail businesses to participate in the Enterprise Zone incentive (Item #18) (EN DECREASE GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes certain retail businesses to participate in the Enterprise Zone incentive (Item #18) (EN DECREASE GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-29 - House - House Vote on HB 13 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#169) (Y: 89 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-06-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 13 FINAL PASSAGE (#150) (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 13 AMENDMENT # 561 BY JACKSON HB 13 BY WRIGHT (#149) (Y: 15 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-16 - House - House Vote on HB 13 FINAL PASSAGE (#43) (Y: 62 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-06-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-06-30HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-06-29HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 89, nays 9, Senate amendments concurred in.
2020-06-29HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2020-06-28SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 26 yeas and 12 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-06-28SenateBy a vote of 15 yeas and 22 nays.
2020-06-28SenateSenate floor amendments read and rejected.
2020-06-28SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2020-06-26SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2020-06-26SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted.
2020-06-26SenateRules suspended.
2020-06-25SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-06-24SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-06-23SenateRead by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2020-06-22SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-06-22SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-06-18SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2020-06-17SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2020-06-16HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 62, nays 32. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-06-11HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/16/20.
2020-06-11HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-06-10HouseReported favorably (11-6).
2020-06-01HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=201ES&b=HB13&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178867
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181094
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185001
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183212
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183134
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183460
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183436
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184490
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184651
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184613
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184660
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184728
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184991
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178868
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180668
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181306
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181472
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183284
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185160
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182449
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184664

Bill Comments

feedback