LA HB13 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-08 - Withdrawn prior to introduction.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-08 - Withdrawn prior to introduction.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a natural or juridical person to serve as director of the Registrars of Voters Employees' Retirement System
Title
Authorizes a natural or juridical person to serve as director of the Registrars of Voters Employees' Retirement System
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | House | Withdrawn prior to introduction. |
2019-02-22 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/22/2019. |
2019-02-20 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2019-02-20 | House | Prefiled. |