LA HB13 | 2018 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Effective date: 6/12/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Effective date: 6/12/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Reduces the amount of certain corporate income tax deductions and provides for continued effectiveness of reductions to certain corporate income tax deductions and exclusions (Item #16) (EN NO IMPACT GF RV See Note)
Title
Reduces the amount of certain corporate income tax deductions and provides for continued effectiveness of reductions to certain corporate income tax deductions and exclusions (Item #16) (EN NO IMPACT GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 13 FINAL PASSAGE (#86) (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 13 FINAL PASSAGE (#30) (Y: 76 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 13 FINAL PASSAGE (#30) (Y: 75 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 13 FINAL PASSAGE (#30) (Y: 76 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 13 FINAL PASSAGE (#30) (Y: 75 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | House | Effective date: 6/12/2018. |
2018-06-12 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 4. |
2018-06-05 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-06-04 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-06-04 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 4 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2018-06-01 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-06-01 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2018-05-31 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 76, nays 20. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-31 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2018-05-30 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/31/18. |
2018-05-30 | House | Notice given. |
2018-05-30 | House | Notice removed |
2018-05-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/18. |
2018-05-29 | House | Notice given. |
2018-05-28 | House | Notice removed |
2018-05-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/18. |
2018-05-28 | House | Notice given. |
2018-05-28 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-05-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/18. |
2018-05-25 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-05-25 | House | Rules suspended. |
2018-05-25 | House | Reported with amendments (15-0). |
2018-05-24 | House | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2018-05-24 | House | Discharged from the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2018-05-22 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2018-05-22 | House | Prefiled. |