LA HB129 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective date: 08/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective date: 08/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to small successions
Title
Provides relative to small successions
Sponsors
Rep. Paula Davis [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 129 FINAL PASSAGE (#530) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 129 FINAL PASSAGE (#245) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 129 FINAL PASSAGE (#245) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | House | Effective date: 08/01/17. |
2017-06-12 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 96. |
2017-06-01 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-05-31 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-05-30 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2017-05-10 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-05-04 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/17. |
2017-05-02 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-01 | House | Reported with amendments (5-0-1). |
2017-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2017-03-27 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2017-03-27 | House | Prefiled. |