LA HB128 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-02 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 7, nays 90. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-02 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 7, nays 90. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits a vendor from requesting that a customer provide personal information when making a purchase
Title
Prohibits a vendor from requesting that a customer provide personal information when making a purchase
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-02 - House - House Vote on HB 128, FINAL PASSAGE (#14) (Y: 7 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2011-05-02 - House - House Vote on HB 128, AMENDMENT # 2 BY BADON, A., MOTION TO ADOPT (#13) (Y: 21 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2011-05-02 - House - House Vote on HB 128, AMENDMENT # 2 BY BADON, A., MOTION TO ADOPT (#13) (Y: 21 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-02 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 7, nays 90. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-04-27 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/2/2011. | |
2011-04-27 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-04-26 | Reported with amendments (14-0) (Regular). | |
2011-04-25 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |
2011-04-08 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/8/2011. | |
2011-04-08 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |
2011-04-08 | Prefiled. |