LA HB124 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Effective date: 08/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the return of certain abandoned funds to the town of Berwick

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the return of certain abandoned funds to the town of Berwick

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 124 FINAL PASSAGE (#406) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Vote on HB 124 FINAL PASSAGE (#163) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24HouseEffective date: 08/01/2019.
2019-05-24HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 8.
2019-05-23HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-05-22SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-05-21HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-05-20HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2019-05-20SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-16SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-15SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-14SenateReported favorably.
2019-05-07SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
2019-05-06SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-06HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 102, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/06/19.
2019-04-29HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-25HouseReported favorably (11-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2019-03-22HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/22/2019.
2019-03-22HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2019-03-22HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback