LA HB124 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-10 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-10 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to employment eligibility requirements for teachers in charter schools (OR INCREASE LF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to employment eligibility requirements for teachers in charter schools (OR INCREASE LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | House | Involuntarily deferred in committee. |
2014-03-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2014-02-07 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/7/2014. |
2014-02-06 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2014-02-06 | House | Prefiled. |