LA HB123 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-14 - Effective date: August 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for restitution for expenses incurred from an escape or attempted escape from any place where an offender is legally confined (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for restitution for expenses incurred from an escape or attempted escape from any place where an offender is legally confined (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-09 - House - House Vote on HB 123, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#740) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 123, FINAL PASSAGE (#503) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - House Vote on HB 123, FINAL PASSAGE (#148) (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-14 Effective date: August 1, 2012.
2012-05-14 Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 117.
2012-05-14 Signed by the President of the Senate on 05/10.
2012-05-10 Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
2012-05-10 Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2012-05-09 Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2012-05-01 Scheduled for concurrence on 5/9/2012.
2012-04-25 Received from the Senate with amendments.
2012-04-24 Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2012-04-19 Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2012-04-18 Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2012-04-17 Reported favorably.
2012-04-03 Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2012-04-02 Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2012-04-02 Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2012-04-02 Called from the calendar.
2012-04-02 Read by title, returned to the calendar.
2012-03-27 Scheduled for floor debate on 4/2/2012.
2012-03-22 Scheduled for floor debate on 3/29/2012.
2012-03-22 Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
2012-03-21 Reported favorably (10-0) (Regular).
2012-03-12 Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2012-02-17 First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/17/2012.
2012-02-15 Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2012-02-15 Prefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback