LA HB123 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-29 - Effective date: August 15, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for estate tax apportionment (EN NO IMPACT GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for estate tax apportionment (EN NO IMPACT GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 123, FINAL PASSAGE (#971) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - House - House Vote on HB 123, GRANTING SENATE PERMISSION (#903) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 123, 2/3 vote (#940) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - House - House Vote on HB 123, FINAL PASSAGE (#283) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-29 Effective date: August 15, 2011.
2011-06-29 Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 346.
2011-06-23 Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
2011-06-23 Signed by the President of the Senate.
2011-06-23 Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2011-06-22 Received from the Senate without amendments.
2011-06-22 Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2011-06-22 Notice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day.
2011-06-22 By a vote of 92 yeas, 0 nays the House approved consideration after the 57th calendar day.
2011-06-22 Notice Senate approved consideration after the 57th calendar day.
2011-06-22 Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57TH calendar day by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
2011-06-21 Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2011-06-21 Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2011-05-26 Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2011-05-25 Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2011-05-24 Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2011-05-24 Called from the calendar.
2011-05-18 Scheduled for floor debate on 5/24/2011.
2011-05-18 Notice given.
2011-05-16 Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
2011-05-11 Scheduled for floor debate on 5/16/2011.
2011-05-11 Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
2011-05-10 Reported favorably (12-0) (Regular).
2011-04-25 Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2011-04-08 First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/8/2011.
2011-04-08 Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2011-04-08 Prefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback